CHILDREN WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS-DREAM HOLIDAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide respite holidays for families who have a child suffering from the life-threatening illness of Cystic Fibrosis. Each family is referred to us by their CF child's hospital. Holidays are for families from all areas of the UK, and are taken within the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 April 1994: Standard registration
- C F DREAM HOLIDAYS (Working name)
- DREAM HOLIDAYS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Johnson | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Quick | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela O'Hanlon | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Quick | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.37k | £238.92k | £226.57k | £258.41k | £244.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.68k | £256.69k | £236.98k | £254.11k | £239.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED AS HAVING CYSTIC FIBROSIS OR OTHER SUCH SIMILAR DISEASE;2.TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR GROUPS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED AS HAVING CYSTIC FIBROSIS OR OTHER SUCH SIMILAR DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Norton Cottages
Tongue End
SPALDING
PE11 3JL
- Phone:
- 01775670399
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window