FRAMPTON COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small village pre-school who provide education, stimulating envirnoment, activites and care for children aged two to four years. We are Ofsted registered and pride ourselves on having a high proportion of caring staff to children. We are non-profit making and everything we do is for the benefit of the children and their families attending the pre-school..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 April 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Seana Kerslake | Chair | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Simmons | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Purdy | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Bussey | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Goodley | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
susan Simmons | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Clark | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.60k | £52.07k | £61.27k | £63.37k | £57.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.02k | £51.21k | £58.54k | £64.13k | £53.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £44.09k | £44.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £975 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUFG COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 KINGS COURT
KIRTON
BOSTON
PE20 1JY
- Phone:
- 07939266154
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window