Trustees FRAMPTON COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1036095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Seana Kerslake Chair 11 November 2024
None on record
Megan Simmons Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Lucy Purdy Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Natalie Bussey Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Nicholas Goodley Trustee 27 December 2018
None on record
susan Simmons Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record
Joanne Clark Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record