Financial history DARJI MITRA MANDAL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1036109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.15k £25.15k £40.55k £83.27k £63.36k
Total expenditure £61.60k £12.22k £41.55k £60.05k £52.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £4.00k N/A N/A