DARJI MITRA MANDAL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Advancement of the Hindu religion, and in particular amongst the Hindu Gujarati people, for promotion, education, support and advancement of the Hindu culture, heritage, music, dance and art by providing a centre, library, exhibitions and displays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 April 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bhartiben Hargovind Tailor | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Narendra Narottamdas Bhagalia | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Urvashi Mahendra Kapadia | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PRATAPRAO CHIKHLIA | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
THAKOR BHAGAT | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHILA TAILOR | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAHENDRA KAPADIA | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
KANTILAL TOPIWALA | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BHARAT THAKORBHAI TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KISHOR KAPADIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.15k | £25.15k | £40.55k | £83.27k | £63.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.60k | £12.22k | £41.55k | £60.05k | £52.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1994 as amended on 28 Jul 2019 as amended on 12 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
To celebrate the identity, culture and practices of Hindus in the UK The promotion of education in particular the knowledge of Hindu music, dance, art and culture in the furtherance of this object to provide a centre library, exhibitions (permanent & temporary) displays. To promote social inclusion for the Public Benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into Society. The relief of poverty.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 QUEENBOROUGH GARDENS
ILFORD
IG2 6YB
- Phone:
- 07818424720
- Email:
- info@darjimandal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window