Financial history MAULDEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.95k £5.89k £6.69k £6.69k £9.78k
Total expenditure £9.09k £16.36k £9.90k £9.90k £8.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A