Financial history BIRKENSHAW C E (C) FIRST AND NURSERY SCHOOL P T A

Charity Number: 1036121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.82k £6.19k £17.38k £14.76k £14.18k
Total expenditure £5.76k £9.32k £9.83k £14.01k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A