Accounts and annual returns ISLE OF ELY YOUTH FORUM

Charity number: 1036129
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 October 2008 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 06 October 2008 249 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 May 2007 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 06 October 2008 614 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 06 October 2008 979 days late