Accounts and annual returns TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL STRETHAM

Charity number: 1036151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2023 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2023 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2023 728 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2023 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2023 1093 days late Download Open in new window