Financial history TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL STRETHAM

Charity Number: 1036151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £54.82k £37.50k £63.14k £100.51k £70.51k
Total expenditure £58.25k £44.52k £51.38k £67.62k £65.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.65k £30.38k £42.77k £63.33k £56.07k