TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL STRETHAM

Charity Number: 1036151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF PRE-SCHOOL SERVICES TO CHILDREN BETWEEN 2YRS 6MONTHS AND 4 YEARS IN STRETHAM VILLAGE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £70,508
Total expenditure: £65,441

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STRETHAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Allen Chair 11 March 2024
None on record
Bryony Bons Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Kate Warner-Kemp Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Heidi Smith Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Melanie Coulson Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
Beth Sievewright Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
Lorraine Coulson Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Susan Yardy Trustee 19 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £54.82k £37.50k £63.14k £100.51k £70.51k
Total expenditure £58.25k £44.52k £51.38k £67.62k £65.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.65k £30.38k £42.77k £63.33k £56.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2023 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2023 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2023 728 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2023 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2023 1093 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tiddlywinks Pre-School
STRETHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL
WOOD LANE
STRETHAM
ELY
CB6 3JN
Phone:
07483175232