Financial history WHITSTONE WADDLERS PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1036157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.21k £177 £1.03k £1.27k £1.06k
Total expenditure £521 £0 £1.50k £999 £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A