COURTNEY LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036160
Charity reporting is up to date (117 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a pre-school who work in the Kingswood area of Bristol. The pre-school have just been given "GOOD" by ofsted, which is fantastic.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £125,662
Total expenditure: £134,189

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COURTNEY LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
  • LADYBIRD PLAYGROUP (KINGSWOOD) (Previous name)
  • LADYBIRD PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KIRSTY HUGHES Chair 17 October 2018
None on record
joanne pope Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
HAYLEY CORDINA-WILSON Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
rebecca orourke Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
CHLOE CULLIMORE Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
kayley WALLER Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
reeve drennen Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £106.76k £102.80k £119.61k £135.11k £125.66k
Total expenditure £110.10k £99.30k £100.55k £158.46k £134.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £108.88k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £104.76k £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 October 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 October 2024 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 May 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 24 May 2024 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2024 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 May 2024 694 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 September 2021 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 September 2021 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 September 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 September 2020 86 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
89 Grimsbury Road
BRISTOL
BS15 9YF
Phone:
01179353022