Financial history FRIENDS OF WESTBURY ON TRYM CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.71k £6.75k £15.78k £30.97k £23.78k
Total expenditure £9.32k £11.93k £8.63k £23.37k £16.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A