FRIENDS OF WESTBURY ON TRYM CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run several events throughout the year. These raise funds for the school and are entertainment for the attendees (usually the children, their parents, teachers, friends and relations)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 12 April 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF WESTBURY ON TRYM (Working name)
- WESTBURY ON TRYM PTA (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanine Swaine | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ross | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Rackham Jo | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sewell | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cheater | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Jenkins | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.71k | £6.75k | £15.78k | £30.97k | £23.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.32k | £11.93k | £8.63k | £23.37k | £16.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 334 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JULY 1993 AS AMENDED 04 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 Clover Ground
BRISTOL
BS9 4UN
- Phone:
- 07793236279
- Email:
- treasurerwotpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window