Financial history TY'R MORWYDD ENVIRONMENTAL STUDY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1036170
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2007 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011
Total gross income £331.62k £397.71k £378.42k £338.57k £347.47k
Total expenditure £369.49k £390.77k £367.94k £341.79k £347.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A