FRIENDS OF SPRINGMEAD SURGERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money by holding a Spring Fair. Afternoon Tea with entertainment, Christmas Stall, Slide shows, Coffee mornings with stalls, hold quizzes. The money raised is for the relief of sickness amongst patients attending Surgery by provision of ancillary medical equipment and services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 April 1994: Standard registration
- 03 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- F O S S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £619 | £78 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48k | £2.31k | £681 | £1.25k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 08 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST PATIENTS ATTENDING SPRINGMEAD SURGERY BY THE PROVISION OF ANCILLARY MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SPRINGMEAD SURGERY, CHARD, SOMERSET.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window