Financial history FRIENDS OF HOCKWOLD SITE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £4.05k £4.28k £11.58k £11.38k
Total expenditure £2.72k £3.88k £4.55k £12.03k £11.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A