DORIS VENNER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing pre-school care and education for 2-5 year olds in the Worcester Park area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £225,120 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 15 April 1994: Standard registration
- DORIS VENNER PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- DORIS VENNER PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Churchill | Chair | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pratik Parikh | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIA CHURCHILL | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £348.99k | £261.54k | £301.09k | £357.95k | £334.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £286.50k | £262.93k | £275.03k | £309.42k | £338.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £234.23k | £234.23k | £234.47k | £266.97k | £225.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VENNER COMMUNITY CENTRE
THE MANOR DRIVE
WORCESTER PARK
SURREY
KT4 7LG
- Phone:
- 02083303672
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window