SPENNYMOOR TOWN COUNCIL MAYORS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising income through social activities and providing grants to local worthy causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
Governance
- 14 April 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Ann Riches | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Nelson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Gilling | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Lowther | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Taylor | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Armstrong | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Anderson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
IAN GELDARD | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/05/2020 | 24/05/2021 | 24/05/2022 | 24/05/2023 | 24/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.58k | £1.72k | £3.77k | £9.12k | £14.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £1.72k | £3.77k | £9.12k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 May 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 May 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 May 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND IN FURTHERANCE IN SUCH MANNER OF SUCH OF THE PURPOSES OF THE NOMINATED CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN CONSULTATION WITH THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THEREOF FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPENNYMOOR TOWN COUNCIL
TOWN HALL BUILDINGS
HIGH STREET
SPENNYMOOR
DL16 6DG
- Phone:
- 01388815276
- Email:
- info@spennymoor-tc.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window