Financial history Tiny Tots Preschool

Charity number: 1036221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £68.15k £74.92k £65.01k £51.49k £60.89k
Total expenditure £73.19k £63.48k £64.25k £61.97k £68.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.76k £67.62k £55.32k £41.16k £48.63k