Financial history SUNFLOWER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1036278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £140.79k £123.87k £127.12k £121.53k £120.79k
Total expenditure £147.16k £131.06k £119.75k £128.92k £128.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £108.45k £110.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £9.12k £0