Accounts and annual returns IVY RICKETTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1036294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 April 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required