Financial history IVY RICKETTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1036294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.06k £4.94k £4.40k £4.69k £4.72k
Total expenditure £709 £9.23k £6.61k £9.21k £16.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A