DAISY CHAINS PRE-SCHOOL (OLDHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a pre-school, offering EYFS education to children from ages 2-5 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £65,525 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 14 April 1994: Standard registration
- 16 August 2022: Funds received from 1049489 FIRBANK SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- ST PAULS PLAYGROUP (OLDHAM) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs J Davison | Chair | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Wharmby | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miss R Wharmby | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.76k | £72.50k | £71.18k | £137.65k | £76.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.39k | £76.35k | £74.32k | £95.56k | £115.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £93.71k | £61.95k | £61.74k | £89.50k | £65.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 November 2022 | 503 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 November 2022 | 503 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 10 JULY 2002 (NAME ONLY)
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
923 Ashton Road
Oldham
OL8 3HX
- Phone:
- 01616336338
- Website:
-
daisychainspreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window