DISABLED PEOPLES FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 April 1994: Standard registration
- 10 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FORUM OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES ACCESS AND RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 24 May 2006 | 113 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 2 OCTOBER 2001 AND 2 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG THOSE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING COUNTIES WHO ARE DISABLED PEOPLE WHETHER PHYSICAL MENTAL BEHAVIOURAL ORGANIC OR SENSORY IN ORIGIN AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVISION OF ACCESS TO INFORMATION AND TECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window