Accounts and annual returns THORNER PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1036320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window