Financial history THORNER PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1036320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £82.51k £93.42k £108.63k £106.09k £114.01k
Total expenditure £86.12k £102.44k £116.82k £96.17k £91.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £67.55k £66.63k N/A £81.07k £60.21k