HARPLEY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ASSISTS HARPLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL TO PAY FOR SOME OF THE EXTRAS NOT COVERED BY THE SCHOOL BUDGET. THE SORTS OF THINGS WE HAVE PAID FOR INCLUDE OUTINGS, COACHES FOR SCHOOL TRIPS, CAMERAS, STAGING FOR SCHOOL PLAYS AND NEW LOCKERS FOR THE CLOAKROOM

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,437
Total expenditure: £11,852

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Corynn Inward Chair 14 June 2023
None on record
Jessica Robb Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Ceri Beckett Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record
Janine Pitcher Trustee 06 May 2020
None on record
Emma Piggott Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.81k £1.97k £2.57k £5.52k £6.44k
Total expenditure £3.07k £1.97k £2.90k £2.33k £11.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Harpley C E Primary School
School Lane
Harpley
KING'S LYNN
PE31 6DY
Phone:
01485520274
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available