Financial history DOWN AMPNEY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1036397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £2.23k £3.10k £5.13k £11.06k £5.78k
Total expenditure £3.14k £1.67k £6.69k £7.92k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A