Financial history THE FRIENDS OF SWAFFHAM JUNIOR ACADEMY

Charity number: 1036411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.13k £82 £112 £91 £80
Total expenditure £4.60k £2.43k £116 £160 £173
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A