Accounts and annual returns ERB'S PALSY GROUP

Charity number: 1036423
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 11 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 11 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2014 15 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 16 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 17 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 17 February 2014 On Time