THE FRIENDS OF JOHN BLOW SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1036424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parents, carers, friends and children fundraising through school and community events to provide additional resources and enrichment opportunities for the pupils attending the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £10,467
Total expenditure: £12,939

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
siobhan field Chair 23 September 2024
None on record
jenny crane Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Emily Taylor Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
ben Carver Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.41k £6.10k £612 £2.54k £10.47k
Total expenditure £8.81k £7.48k £456 £6.42k £12.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
John Blow Primary School
Snowdon Road
Collingham
Nottinghamshire
NG23 7PT
Phone:
01636892485
Website:

No information available