AGE UK SURREY

Charity number: 1036450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Age UK Surrey has been working closely with older people in the county since 1963. The Charity has developed services to meet the increasing demands of an ageing population, providing a Homehelp service, gardening, befriending, Shopmobility, Information & Advice and Healthy Living, and a computer Drop-in centre based in Guildford where older people learn IT skills.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 1994: Standard registration
  • 11 October 2016: Funds received from 1110708 SOCIAL INFORMATION ON DISABILITY (SID) LIMITED
  • 10 July 2024: Funds received from 205130 GEORGE C BATEMAN BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • A C SURREY (Working name)
  • AGE UK SURREY (Working name)
  • AGE CONCERN SURREY (Previous name)
  • AGE CONCERN SURREY SERVICES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Trowse MBE Trustee 06 December 2024
None on record
Alexander James Ford Trustee 03 October 2024
VOLUNTARY ACTION SOUTH WEST SURREY
Received: On time
Richard Mills Trustee 24 August 2024
None on record
Conrad Bennett Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Angela Boodoo Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Steven Avis Trustee 13 August 2023
None on record
Jason Paul Webster Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
Joy Allen Trustee 28 July 2020
AGE UK RUNNYMEDE AND SPELTHORNE
Received: On time
AGE CONCERN (SPELTHORNE)
Received: On time
THE ORCHARD CLUB (HASLEMERE)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.36m £1.43m £1.55m £1.36m £1.94m
Total expenditure £1.21m £1.04m £1.38m £1.98m £1.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £152.98k
Income from government grants £242.48k £188.04k £197.55k £190.06k £233.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £501.96k £918.98k £858.13k £337.42k £723.73k
Income - Other trading activities £82.68k £0 £0 £28.51k £4.94k
Income - Charitable activities £740.64k £461.71k £638.03k £971.47k £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.52k £25.49k £22.25k £24.08k £15.20k
Income - Other £0 £28.66k £29.59k £0 £4.94k
Income - Legacies £341.92k £519.46k £32.78k £161.42k £367.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £916.42k £1.23m £1.80m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.56k £102.73k £153.98k £183.91k £182.34k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £39.68k £35.16k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £20.04k £4.91k £423 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.12m £17.37k £690.46k £781.80k £711.66k
Long-term investments £0 £1.26m £1.26m £667.04k £578.23k
Other assets £608.19k £981.52k £595.11k £318.36k £568.76k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £133.25k £80.42k £203.70k £136.88k £112.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chapel Lane
Godalming
SURREY
GU8 5EZ
Phone:
01483503414