ICKFORD PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP INCORPORATING AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare providers in term-time, 5 days a week from 7:45am to 6pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £2,154 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 April 1994: Standard registration
- ICKFORD PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine White | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Franziska Warren | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rogers | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Rogers | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.90k | £141.07k | £171.67k | £175.93k | £153.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.56k | £133.63k | £159.69k | £175.47k | £150.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £59.78k | £3.58k | £7.17k | £2.50k | £2.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ickford Pre-School
Sheldon Road
Ickford
AYLESBURY
HP18 9HY
- Phone:
- 01844388785
- Email:
- psasc.ickford@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window