Accounts and annual returns CATSFIELD UNDER FIVES PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1036464
Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 June 2024 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 June 2024 339 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2022 345 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2021 469 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2022 710 days late Download Open in new window