Accounts and annual returns THE STRANGWARD TRUST

Charity Number: 1036494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window