Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JAMES CHARLES BURTON
Charity number: 217801-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 30TH APRIL 1909 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 30TH MAY 1913, 31ST JULY 1917 AND 28TH SEPTEMBER 1934.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
FORMER ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DOWLES
Registration history
- 04 December 1963: Standard registration
- 09 February 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.