Financial history REDGATE FARM ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1036506
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £530.94k £306.14k £223.17k £268.09k £332.34k
Total expenditure £255.32k £188.87k £206.97k £235.11k £256.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £124.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £176.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £124.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £452 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £229.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £162.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £89.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £3.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A