Trustees REDGATE FARM ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Charity number: 1036506

Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Diane Neville | Chair | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Plant | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kelleher | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN KNAPP | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Clarke | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hanna | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.