Friends of St Mary's Ipswich

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise fund-raising activities such as quiz nights, Christmas and summer fairs, etc, to provide extra equipment and activities for the pupils at St Mary's Catholic Primary School, Ipswich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 April 1994: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S PA (Working name)
- ST MARY'S PARENT & TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST MARY'S R C PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST MARY'S R C PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David O'Driscoll | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Claire McLean | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael Alexander Gornall | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.19k | £7.59k | £1.92k | £5.93k | £10.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £10.02k | £6.93k | £9.82k | £903 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1981 AS AMENDED 13/11/1985 AND 6/9/2011 as amended on 11 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IPSWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Catholic Primary School
Woodbridge Road
IPSWICH
IP4 4EU
- Phone:
- 01473807503
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window