HILL BILLIES PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Gloucestershire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 April 1994: Standard registration
- 20 February 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HILL BILLIES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.30k | £25.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £26.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 28 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 17 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED ON 23 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window