THE RIDLEY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £162 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 April 1994: Standard registration
- RIDLEY HALL (Working name)
- THE VILLAGE HALL SOUTH WARNBOROUGH (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RICHARD KENNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip William Elston Diggens | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Phelan | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Armstrong | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Isaac Fairhead | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Rochfort Garrard | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin McBride | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Hall | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY CLAYTON BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.58k | £23.94k | £31.02k | £19.43k | £20.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.52k | £15.02k | £10.61k | £13.45k | £18.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.57k | N/A | £162 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1926, SCHEME DATED 7 OCTOBER 2010 AND TRUST DEED 18 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES, NOT PRIMARILY OF A RELIGIOUS NATURE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF SOUTH WARNBOROUGH
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SOUTH WARNBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 NASH MEADOWS
SOUTH WARNBOROUGH
HOOK
RG29 1RJ
- Phone:
- 01256861347
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window