FRIENDS OF LANGHAM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises money which is used to support the education of children attending Langham Primary School by buying equipment & subsidising events & activities for the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 15 April 1994: Standard registration
- FOLS (Working name)
- LANGHAM COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LANGHAM SCHOOL FRIENDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Stevens | Chair | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Newsam | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Goodrich | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Haynes | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Irene Warren | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Wilton | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Head | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Phillip Broadbent | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Catherine Wells | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pamment | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Linda Alston | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elaine Parker | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ANDREW MACDONALD | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.25k | £378 | £3.01k | £6.53k | £9.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.82k | £5.60k | £3.31k | £5.12k | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 1997, 21 MARCH 2002 AND 27 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LANGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANGHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL ROAD
LANGHAM
COLCHESTER
CO4 5PB
- Phone:
- 07881017292
- Email:
- lauracwells@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window