Financial history THE FRIENDS OF T V E (TELEVISION TRUST FOR THE ENVIRONMENT)

Charity number: 1036556
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £15.15k £2.05k £13.63k £11.84k £10.22k
Total expenditure £20.10k £10.27k £14.22k £10.62k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A