Financial history BUNNY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1036619
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.52k £3.50k £16.47k £16.08k £10.12k
Total expenditure £10.73k £2.00k £13.47k £18.69k £6.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A