Financial history Friends of Markland Hill

Charity number: 1036628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £3.12k £13.62k £16.55k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £661 £8.19k £5.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A