Financial history MILFORD HAVEN HERITAGE AND MARITIME MUSEUM

Charity number: 1036633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.49k £62.27k £33.63k £37.01k £37.01k
Total expenditure £22.78k £18.99k £34.33k £58.54k £58.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.75k £60.30k N/A £11.00k £10.00k