Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF EARDISLEY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1036635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 December 2024 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 December 2024 535 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 December 2024 900 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 March 2022 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required