Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WOODHOUSE HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036648
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2004 09 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 Not Required